THE FRIENDS OF THE GLOBE LANCING

Charity Number: 1135559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charities aim is to raise funds to be spent on the children of the Globe Primary School, our current aim is to supplement towards the covering of the school swimming pool, with the potential to extend it's use within the local community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023

Total income: £8,769
Total expenditure: £11,899

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS OF THE GLOBE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clare Ashenden Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 01/09/2022 01/09/2023
Total gross income £9.35k £5.00k £2.47k £5.04k £8.77k
Total expenditure £5.00k £3.88k £6.36k £2.23k £11.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2022 26 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2021 31 August 2022 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 29 June 2021 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 Upper Boundstone Lane
LANCING
BN15 9QX
Phone:
01903764534
Website:

No information available