THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, HACKENTHORPE, SHEFFIELD

Charity Number: 1126697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all and provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Promotion of Christianity through preaching, teaching and staging of events and meetings. Promotion of Christianity through activities supporting local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £27,747
Total expenditure: £14,174

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 2008: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • CHRIST CHURCH PCC, HACKENTHORPE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLAIRE WELCH Chair 28 July 2024
None on record
Kerry McMahon Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
June Godbehere Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Julian Godbehere Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Frances Ireson Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Kate Mirfin Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
patricia White Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
David Scott Walker Trustee 13 April 2019
None on record
TINA DIANE MARY TOMLINSON RDN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £51.79k £39.30k £34.03k £25.88k £27.75k
Total expenditure £58.01k £36.95k £29.98k £25.55k £14.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
63 SHEFFIELD ROAD
HACKENTHORPE
SHEFFIELD
S12 4LR
Phone:
01142489894
Website:

No information available