Trustees ILFORD HIGH ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1127683

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Willis | Chair | 03 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roy Daswani | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
KEITH JORDAN | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ABIDEMI OLUBISI TUBI | Trustee | 29 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Tyler | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
ONKAR SINGH | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hinds | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Eversley | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Hunte | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN WILLIAM MORRIS | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.