THE ASSOCIATION OF ENGLISH CATHEDRALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As representative of the Chapters of the Anglican cathedrals, the AEC deals with governmental agencies, central Church bodies and other organisations on behalf of the cathedrals, although it cannot commit any individual Chapter to a specific decision. It also promotes the role of cathedrals and encourages sharing of best practice and information to assist cathedrals in fulfilling their purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 February 2009: Standard registration
- AEC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Very Rev'd Jo Kelly-Moore | Chair | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Emily Charlotte MacKenzie | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Very Rev'd Nicholas Charles Papadopulos | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Jonathan Graham Ward | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
ANNA VICTORIA PITT | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Matthew James Vernon | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Very Rev'd David Robert Malvern Monteith | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Aidan Stephen George Platten | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
David Robert Bilton | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
THE VERY REVEREND ROGERS MORGAN GOVENDER | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev PETER HOWELL-JONES | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £478.61k | £194.13k | £196.11k | £242.46k | £165.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.93k | £213.42k | £291.62k | £223.73k | £201.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/01/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14/06/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND TO FURTHER THE MISSION OF THE ANGLICAN DENOMINATION BY: (1)SUPPORTING THE ENGLISH ANGLICAN CATHEDRALS (THE MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY) AND WESTMINSTER ABBEY AND ST GEORGE’S CHAPEL WINDSOR IN THEIR WORK OF ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY REPRESENTING THE COMMON INTERESTS OF CATHEDRALS BOTH IN NATIONAL AND ECCLESIASTICAL CONTEXTS. (2)WORKING WITH THE NATIONAL CHURCH INSTITUTIONS AND OTHER PARTS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN FURTHERING THE MISSION AND WORK OF CATHEDRALS; (3) WORKING WITH THE CHURCHES’ LEGISLATION ADVISORY SERVICE AND OTHER APPROPRIATE ECUMENICAL BODIES IN FURTHERING THE MISSION AND WORK OF CATHEDRALS; (4) WORKING WITH THE GOVERNMENT AND ITS AGENCIES TO REPRESENT THE INTERESTS OF CATHEDRALS AND ACHIEVE AN ENVIRONMENT WHERE CATHEDRALS ARE ENABLED TO FULFIL THEIR MISSION AND WORK; (5) DEBATING AND PROPOSING POLICIES AND OTHER MATTERS AFFECTING CATHEDRALS, INCLUDING THEIR ROLE IN ADVANCING EDUCATION; COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE; AND ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT. ALSO ASSISTING IN DEVELOPING THEIR ROLE IN PROMOTING RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY AND EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (6) ENCOURAGING THE DEVELOPMENT AND SHARING OF BEST PRACTICE BETWEEN CATHEDRALS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Greenways
BECKENHAM
Kent
BR3 3NG
- Phone:
- 07860921419
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window