Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF HAWKWELL
Charity number: 1128453

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicolas Rowan | Chair | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Addison | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Lazell | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Buckell | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Guy Harper | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Garner | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Paul Chapman | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Darley | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Brown | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Pearson | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Favier | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Mountier | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Chapman | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ROBINSON | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON MEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN JOHN GARDNER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.