Financial history DEREHAM BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1127482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £251.94k £208.02k £219.90k £249.06k £282.72k
Total expenditure £197.17k £171.91k £199.45k £226.39k £280.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A