Trustees DEREHAM BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1127482

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev NIGEL RICHARD JONATHAN BAYLEY | Chair | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Rosemary Clarke | Trustee | 20 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Peter Neale | Trustee | 20 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leah Elisabeth Bash | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Teresa Emily Waller | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Rogers | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Alfred Mersh | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Keziah Grace Rogers | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANITA JANE CLARKE | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Taylor | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Catherine Susan Mann | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Gardner | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Pyman | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Fraser Morrison | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Charles Cockbill | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV David Matthew Ward | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Clarke | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.