Trustees SELSDON BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity Number: 1126971

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Trevor Harold James Neill | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Booth Wright | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Carolyn Callender | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Ann Howard | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norman Washington Robinson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Brian Ridgway | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Sheila Cox | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam James Maxwell White | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andy Crossley | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.