Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE ECCLESTON

Charity number: 1127818
Charity reporting is up to date (76 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Mark Crosby Trustee 28 April 2023
None on record
DAVID THORPE Trustee 09 January 2023
None on record
Rev Gareth Richard Banton Trustee 05 September 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES WITH ST MATTHEW, ECCLESTON, IN THE DIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL
Recently registered
Thomas Paul Kelly Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Karen Marie Grant Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Lorraine Doreen Rose Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Peter Christopher Anderson Trustee 01 June 2013
None on record
MISS ANNE HAYES B.A. HONS (MIDWIFERY) Trustee
None on record
DIANE LISBETH WRIGHT BSC, PGCE Trustee
None on record
LORNA MARGARET ANNE LLEWELLYN Trustee
None on record