THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHINGFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC of the Parish of Chingford has the responsibility of co-operating with the incumbent and his staff, in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has maintenance responsibilities for the two churches and halls and a clergy house.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 22 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
- 29 September 2022: Funds received from 239844 CHARITY OF MRS ELIZA KING
- 29 September 2022: Funds received from 239842 MRS HARRIET WATERS'S CHARITY
- 30 September 2022: Funds received from 239843 WIDOWS' GRASS
- 04 October 2022: Funds received from 239841 THE CHARITIES OF JOHN, ANN AND REBECCA POPPLEWELL
- CHINGFORD PARISH CHURCH PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Neophytou | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Clayden | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Renwick | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Marilyn Claydon | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Young | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hemsted | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Kennedy | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Fox | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hilary Musker | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD VINCENT | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE NEOPHYTOU | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Codling | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MIKE HILL | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE HILTON | Trustee | 16 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUE EMERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE EMERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LARRY RELFE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £335.01k | £192.22k | £135.86k | £172.94k | £189.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £392.15k | £198.56k | £178.43k | £193.45k | £207.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 THE GREEN WALK
LONDON
E4 7ER
- Phone:
- 02085291291
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window