Financial history KINGSWINFORD AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity Number: 1127389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.52k £5.55k £6.46k £6.05k £9.76k
Total expenditure £10.27k £7.54k £6.16k £6.59k £6.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A