GRANTHAM CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve the good in the old and encourage the good in the new
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 25 March 1970: Standard registration
- GRANTHAM CIVIC TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN BERNARD Manterfield | Chair | 10 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Lyn Robinson | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christine Thomas | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Callum Gait | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Robert Richardson | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Thurlow Hazelwood | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Arthur William Ambrose | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|||||
RUTH CROOK | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|||||
ROGER BLAKEMAN | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM COOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.79k | £10.20k | £10.88k | £9.99k | £10.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.54k | £5.25k | £10.09k | £11.76k | £9.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JANUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 20 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED ON 23/03/2015 as amended on 24 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
GRANTHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 ST. ANDREWS
GRANTHAM
NG31 9PE
- Phone:
- 01476575678
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window