Financial history FRIENDS OF ECSAT

Charity number: 1132881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/04/2020 14/04/2021 14/04/2022 14/04/2023 14/04/2024
Total gross income £6.45k £1.73k £1.82k £1.52k £1.33k
Total expenditure £4.20k £1.36k £4.47k £315 £2.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A