TOLL BAR PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational activities beyond what the school is expected to purchase through LA funding for trips, other events, after school club materials etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Doncaster
Governance
- 10 March 2009: Standard registration
- TOLL BAR PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Bower BA Hons | Chair | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Whaley | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS A J NEWTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.98k | £751 | £2.41k | £2.41k | £218 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.15k | £595 | £1.60k | £2.32k | £90 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF TOLL BAR PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT OVER AND ABOVE WHAT THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY PROVIDES FOR THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
TOLL BAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOLL BAR PRIMARY SCHOOL
ASKERN ROAD
TOLL BAR
DONCASTER
DN5 0QR
- Phone:
- 01302874324
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window