THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, COFTON HACKETT AND ST ANDREW, BARNT GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wehaveconsideredguidanceonpublicbenefit,inparticulartheadvancementofreligion.WeareanAnglicanparishseekinginourowncontexttodemonstratethepublicbenefitswhichlocalchurcheshavebroughttotheir communities.Wenurture&spreadtheChristianfaithamongallages through:Worship,Prayer,Gospel teaching,developing knowledge and trust in Jesus, providing pastoral care for those in the parish, Missionary and other work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 03 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
- PCC COFTON HACKETT AND BARNT GREEN (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Sedgwick | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Sedgwick | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Lucas | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Stephenson | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Ann Simkiss | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Lucas | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hobbs | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Milford | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Newton | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Hall | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Milford | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Gwen Onyon | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mike Powell | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katie Leaver | Trustee | 03 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Hall | Trustee | 08 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Julia Dawn Powell | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS ALLENBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OWEN HUGH EDWARDS FPMI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY JANE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY ISOBEL AVEYARD B SC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.21k | £139.15k | £171.74k | £235.98k | £171.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £256.54k | £183.86k | £172.41k | £190.67k | £203.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Andrews Church
24 Sandhills Road
Barnt Green
BIRMINGHAM
B45 8NR
- Phone:
- 01214477097
- Email:
- office@chandbgparish.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window