REIGATE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a Service of Methodist Worship in Reigate every Sunday and at other Christian festivals. Runs annual membership courses. Runs Alpha Courses for those wishing to explore the Christian faith. Provides a summer Holiday Club week for local children. Provides meeting facilities for groups serving the needs of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

31 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
31 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beatrix Elizabeth Lawrence | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Katie Jefferies | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Amanda Rayner | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jemima Strydom | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Gordon | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Kate Burman | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Philomena Mullan | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Alex Dorlandt | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Grant | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Gillian Baalham | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Sue Leppard | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Nelson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Elisabeth Brooks | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Michael Woods | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Glenys Mason | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Laura Jobling | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Burman | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Clive McKie | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH GREGORY | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
LINDSAY JUDITH THOMPSON | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
PAMELA PALMER | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Nelson | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
Stephen Tickell | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES PULFER | Trustee | 01 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ROSALYN MARY NORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARY VICTORIA PULFER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR J S HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
HILARY JANE AUSTIN BSC MSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GRAHAM LESLIE NORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
IAN PATTISON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.98k | £103.70k | £132.68k | £164.05k | £184.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.37k | £150.33k | £163.56k | £182.81k | £170.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, SURREY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Reigate Methodist Church
High Street
Reigate
RH2 9AE
- Phone:
- 01737652256
- Email:
- ipattison@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window