OFFINGTON PARK METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Place of Worship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

25 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 22 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 17 June 2024: Funds received from 1110952 OFFINGTON PARK PRE-SCHOOL
- OPMC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dawn Rosemary Carn | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Rev Rosemarie Elaine Gaye Clarke | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Terry Edmondson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Barry Spooner | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Pamela Clayton | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rosalyn Merrick | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Francis John Patrick Knight | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Emily Jane Wilson | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN EDWARD BISHOP | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
GILLIAN POWELL | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|||||||
PAMELA ANN FROST | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Lee Michael Newman | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
NICHOLAS HENRY SKINNER | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
KEVIN THOMAS HARMER | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
CATHERINE LOUISE BURGESS | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
JACQUELINE MARGARET BROWN | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
CAROLYN DEBORAH WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JEANNE MICHELE FUNNELL | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Hilary Ann Colbourn | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
ADAM JOHN COOK | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Charlotte Gould | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Lesley SKINNER | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JOY ELIZABETH BARNES | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|||||||
ALISON MARGARET WRIGHT | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
MICHAEL ERNEST JAMES POWELL MIIA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.30k | £119.48k | £150.28k | £182.14k | £177.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.83k | £133.82k | £142.84k | £141.07k | £168.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
OFFINGTON PARK METHODIST CHURCH
SOUTH FARM ROAD
WORTHING
BN14 7TN
- Phone:
- 01903205722
- Email:
- office@offingtonpark.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window