CO-MISSIONUK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bridgend
- Carmarthenshire
- Newport City
- Cambodia
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 05 March 2009: Standard registration
- SGM (UK) TRUST (Working name)
- SOVEREIGN GRACE MINISTRIES (UK) TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GAVIN SMITH | Chair |
|
||||||
Bob McCan | Trustee | 10 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
LEWIS RODERICK | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER GREASLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.72k | £19.86k | £18.48k | £22.68k | £22.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.80k | £27.42k | £26.81k | £20.00k | £23.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/2013
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE UNDERWRITTEN FIRST SCHEDULE, THE SUPPORT OF LOCAL CHURCHES AND THEIR LEADERS, THE TRAINING OF CHRISTIAN LEADERS BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF AND EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO SOVEREIGN GRACE MINISTRIES AND COVENANT MERCIES INTERNATIONAL INVOLVING THE SUPPORT AND ESTABLISHMENT OF LOCAL CHURCHES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND AROUND THE WORLD AND PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO THE POOR AND NEEDY. (C) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN A CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRISTCHURCH CENTRE
BT COMPOUND
MALPAS ROAD
NEWPORT
NP20 5PP
- Phone:
- 01633822211
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window