Trustees RICHMOND OPERA
Charity number: 1127803

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Henry Michael Rolt | Chair | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simin Xiao | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER ALLEN PALMER BROWN | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Brigid Helen Constantine | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ayala Gomez | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne McManus | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Luke Reader | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Lynch | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Caroline Stallebrass | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.