Masjid Ibraheem & Education Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish a five times daily prayer facility To conduct marriage ceremonies and funeral prayers. All marriages are solemnised under the Islamic Sharia, only once they have been registered at the registrars office To advance education And to facilitate community events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
Governance
- 10 March 2009: Standard registration
- THORNBURY MOSQUE (Working name)
- IBRAHEEMIYA EDUCATIONAL & HEALTH ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhammad Sohail | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Masood Ahmed | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Munir Khaliq | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Asim Khan | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.49k | £164.37k | £116.31k | £213.49k | £218.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.79k | £130.29k | £127.25k | £155.19k | £209.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £65.27k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 March 2024 | 416 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 March 2024 | 416 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 April 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 April 2022 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/07/2013 as amended on 01 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
2.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, INCLUDING PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AMONGST PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN BRADFORD AND, WHERE NECESSARY, TO ACHIEVE THIS BY WORKING IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE BENEFICIARIES, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER AGENCIES. 2.2 TO ESTABLISH A MOSQUE FOR THE COMMUNITY. 2.3 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THORNBURY MOSQUE MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
MASJID IBRAHEEM & EDUCATION CENTRE
Crofts Hall
Lower Rushton Road
BRADFORD
BD3 8PX
- Phone:
- 07832673712
- Email:
- admin@miec.co.uk
- Website:
-
miec.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window