ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTHAM 2000

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising and distribution of funds raised in accordance with the principles of the Rotary Organisation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 25 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iain Wilson | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Roger Boyland | Trustee | 07 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVE ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.14k | £23.47k | £18.11k | £9.11k | £6.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.45k | £22.98k | £17.26k | £4.45k | £3.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 389 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 389 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 May 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTDEED 08 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST to apply .both the capital and income thereof to or for the relief of the poor and needy or such other charitable purposes as the Club shall in duly constituted meeting from time to time direct.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sycamore Lodge
Church Street
Stockton
Southam
CV47 8JG
- Phone:
- 01926815831
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window