THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MERROW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As on original application
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S MERROW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Donald Victor Eagle | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Edward Penn Hunt | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helene Steenfeldt-Kristensen | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Margaret Potter | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Dobson | Trustee | 23 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Tappin | Trustee | 23 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Vanessa Thompson | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Denise Farquharson | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David William Hunt | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joe Bullock | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Anthony Avis FCIPD | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Chambers | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Tappin | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.71k | £197.37k | £200.82k | £252.12k | £257.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.10k | £252.19k | £188.29k | £244.08k | £274.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 February 2022 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 February 2022 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Saint John the Evangelist
Merrow
222 Epsom Road
GUILDFORD
- Phone:
- 01483 454621
- Email:
- office@saintjohns.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window