Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MERROW
Charity number: 1127555

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Donald Victor Eagle | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Edward Penn Hunt | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helene Steenfeldt-Kristensen | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Margaret Potter | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Dobson | Trustee | 23 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Tappin | Trustee | 23 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Vanessa Thompson | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Denise Farquharson | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David William Hunt | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joe Bullock | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Anthony Avis FCIPD | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Chambers | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Tappin | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.