Financial history OLGA EDUCATION & TRAINING PROJECT TRUST

Charity number: 1129881
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2011 01/04/2012 01/04/2013 01/04/2014 01/04/2015
Total gross income £12.47k £20.50k £23.09k £22.74k £26.03k
Total expenditure £12.47k £20.50k £23.09k £22.74k £25.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £23.28k