FREE INTERNET FOR ALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide access to internet facilities and skill-based learning for the young people. We also provide advice on education and skills. These activities will benefit young people of Somali origin who are socially and economically disadvantaged who are in need support in order to participate more fully in the society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Islington
Governance
- 05 March 2009: Standard registration
- 24 November 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SBC INTERNET (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.99k | £55.68k | £52.51k | £43.90k | £54.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.79k | £50.33k | £51.39k | £42.16k | £60.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 01 February 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 01 February 2020 | 1 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 DECEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF SOMALI ORIGIN LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACCESS TO INTERNET FACILITIES, APPROPRIATE SKILL-BASED LEARNING, TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES AND OTHER SUCH ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT. TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
ISLINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window