WEALDSTONE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of regular public acts of worship open to members of the church & non members alike. Provision of sacred space, a building, for prayer and contemplation. The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses & small groups. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick & bereaved. Provision of a Friendship Cafe, a fellowship meeting and toddlers group, with a Christian Ethos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Harrow
Governance
- 28 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Audrey Delores Browne BD MA | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Sampson Osae Atiemo | Trustee | 06 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Isabella Ann Crichlow | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Watton | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander Nixon | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Phillips | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUNE JOSEPHINE MENSAH | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy David Thorp | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD WILSON | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN RILEY | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jessie Schoon | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|||||
JOYCELYN ANITA SHORTER | Trustee | 09 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOY DRUMMOND | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|||||
LESLIE JOHN STANTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM THOMAS BURT ALDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS YVONNE BRADSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARY ALDRIDGE | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID MILNE | Trustee |
|
||||||
AELWYN TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.97k | £97.87k | £148.45k | £133.55k | £125.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.94k | £108.75k | £132.19k | £130.54k | £94.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wealdstone Methodist Church
Locket Road
HARROW
Middlesex
HA3 7ND
- Phone:
- 020 8861 0913
- Email:
- wealdstonechurch@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window