THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN COLCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £9,917 from 1 government grant(s)
People

22 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 03 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S AND ST LUKES PCC COLCHESTER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Dever | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Rose | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Lovell | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Sallis | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Oldham | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Roberts | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY BERRY | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Tiffin | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Morgan | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JAMES READ | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Cornell | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Cockrill | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Anthony | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Sirett | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Shelley | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALEX QUAYLE | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Hadfield | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Theodosius | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Luxton | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MULVEY | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Marshall | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Moore | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £379.22k | £408.63k | £306.42k | £357.77k | £395.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £404.44k | £368.92k | £311.40k | £367.60k | £437.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.04k | £23.55k | £6.00k | £9.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John's Church
St John's Close
COLCHESTER
CO4 0HP
- Phone:
- 01206843232
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window