THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATH,ST LUKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all.Private space for prayer and contemplation.Pastoral work visiting the sick and bereaved.Youth club with Christian ethos.Assemblies led in local schools.Christianity is promoted through staging events, meetings and distribution of literature.Mission of the church promoted by providing activities for all age groups.Other charities supported in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 30 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
- ST LUKE'S PCC, BATH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Elizabeth Rich | Chair | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Paul Way | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CHARLES MARRIOTT | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ALICE WALKER | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
COLIN SHAW | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Tomlin | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Helen Stephinson MBE | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN JAMES MCKAY | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Lindsay Margaret Glazebrook | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Mandeville | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Albrow | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Martin Best MA | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Stubbs | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE DIANE LESLIE FRY | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN GEOFFREY NORMAN | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tim Harris | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Liz Richardson | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUTH JOAN SARA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.91k | £193.82k | £179.97k | £198.00k | £193.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.96k | £221.14k | £179.93k | £190.38k | £190.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes Church Office
Hatfield Road
BATH
BA2 2BD
- Phone:
- 01225331898
- Email:
- admin@stlukesbath.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window