MARPLE LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly meetings held from September to April with speaker talks on local history and history further afield. Activities include Field trips; Summer evening walks; Monthly e-Newsletter and Website. We manage an Archives Centre with online catalogue for documents / items relating to Marple, Marple Bridge, Mellor, Compstall, Hawk Green, High Lane and Strines. We work with likeminded organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cheshire East
- Derbyshire
- Stockport
Governance
- 25 August 1970: Standard registration
- MARPLE ANTIQUARIAN AND LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE COLLINS | Chair | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Wellings | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DALE SPENCER | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEREK DRYSDALE | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Philip Derbyshire | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE THISTLETON | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CRUIKSHANK | Trustee | 13 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MARY HUDSON WILSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY ELAINE ATKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.46k | £450 | £2.58k | £3.70k | £4.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.39k | £1.95k | £2.35k | £3.12k | £4.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 APRIL 1992. as amended on 14 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP AND FOSTER AN INTEREST IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE HISTORY OF MARPLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
MARPLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Chapel Houses
Marple
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK6 7LF
- Phone:
- 01614273802
- Email:
- chairman@mlhs.org.uk
- Website:
-
marplelocalhistorysociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window