CAMBRIDGE CARBON FOOTPRINT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cambridge Carbon Footprint engages people from all walks of life to tackle climate change through personal commitments and collective action by providing information, resources, and support. Our approach uses circular economy and conscious consumption principles. We work primarily in Cambridgeshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £66,172 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
2021 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 05 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stacey Ruggles | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Dyer-Smith | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Coulman-Cook | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Danielle Newble | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Alexander William Mark Chidley | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain James Smith | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shaun David Lindsay | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Dang | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.52k | £106.68k | £66.29k | £119.32k | £148.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.46k | £76.23k | £93.81k | £77.20k | £127.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.25k | £51.00k | N/A | £49.49k | £66.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 December 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 December 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY RAISING AWARENESS OF CLIMATE CHANGE AND ENCOURAGING PRACTICAL STEPS TO REDUCE ATMOSPHERIC CARBON DIOXIDE LEVELS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cambridge Carbon Footprint
The Bike Depot
140 Cowley Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 0DL
- Phone:
- 01223844291
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window