THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS ROTHERHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acts of public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer & contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick & the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity via sermons, courses & small groups. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events & meetings. Promoting the whole mission of the Church via provision of Coffee Mornings. Baptisms, weddings, funerals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,940 from 3 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rotherham
Governance
- 20 May 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS ROTHERHAM PCC (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Phil Batchford | Chair | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elizabeth Mary Isley | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Martin Bennett | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Castle | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Naylor | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sue Armstrong | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Louise Castle | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Justine Smith | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Marjorie Russell | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm S Turner | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Doreen Clifford | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|||||
ANNE HICKS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JAYNE ROGAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHIRLEY JONES CQSW,DSW. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR EDWARD RODDIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Debbie Stephenson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANNE ASHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.75k | £177.23k | £431.99k | £1.28m | £336.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.24k | £184.62k | £354.64k | £739.24k | £376.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £151.23k | £14.36k | £1.94k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £673.35k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.14k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.89k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £578.43k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £617.59k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.07k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £881 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £700 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £736.29k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
01 December 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Centre
Vicarage Lane
ROTHERHAM
South Yorkshire
S65 1AA
- Phone:
- 01709364341
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window