Financial history CROWBOROUGH UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity Number: 1128386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £14.52k £8.86k £30.26k £34.77k £19.68k
Total expenditure £12.86k £11.38k £28.67k £30.04k £18.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A