Trustees CROWBOROUGH UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity Number: 1128386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT JOHN STONE Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
KATHRYN WILLIG Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Yvonne Mary Stone Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Robert Martin Castle Trustee 20 February 2020
None on record
Lynda Lenton Trustee 21 February 2018
None on record
Jane Lazell Trustee 21 February 2018
None on record
Trevor Probert Trustee 21 February 2018
None on record