COLCHESTER BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church has expressed its purpose as being "To follow Jesus Christ and make Him known" and its vision as being "To be a growing, thriving, nurturing family of God". In order to acheive these, the Church provides a variety of activities to its members and to the community generally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 03 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
- COLCHESTER BAPTIST CHURCH, ELD LANE, COLCHESTER CO1 1LS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ayotunde Ikuesan | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kaoru Magee | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ann Walder | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
William Butcher LLB, LLM | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
BRENDA READE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Terry Tennens | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Chapman | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Pulford | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
TIM ROSE | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL GEORGE BAKER FCCA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.23k | £198.30k | £207.11k | £177.42k | £199.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.60k | £182.63k | £158.51k | £159.35k | £232.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Colchester Baptist Church
Eld Lane
Colchester
CO1 1LS
- Phone:
- 01206 571879
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window