Accounts and annual returns ENFIELD EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH

Charity number: 1128298
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On Time