THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, MIDDLEWICH

Charity Number: 1127335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim and purpose of the Church is "to glorify God and enjoy him for ever". The Rector, supported enthusiastically by the PCC and the lay and ordained staff, prayerfully pursues this objective in planning the services, outreach and pastoral ministry of the Church in the community, We hope the activities during 2015 brought us nearer to meeting our objective throughout Middlewich.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £167,014
Total expenditure: £168,669

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • MIDDLEWICH PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev SIMON DREW Chair 22 April 2011
None on record
Paul Hassall Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Ivan Smith Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Stewart Prentice Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Fiona Tarry Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
JOHN CURRIE Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Katy Drew Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Patricia Smith Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Josie Margaret Clewes Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Rev Julie Hassall Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Graham Ikin Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Joanne Wilson Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Sue Ikin Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Anne Latham Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Elaine Reynolds Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Ian Jeffery Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Rev Alison Boulton Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
STEVE BAILEY Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
NEIL CLEWES Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Keith Yearley Trustee 18 July 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £162.11k £148.88k £258.58k £156.40k £167.01k
Total expenditure £159.74k £144.30k £151.86k £158.36k £168.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.43k £11.62k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Poplar Fell
Nantwich Road
Middlewich
CW10 9HG
Phone:
01606833124