Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, MIDDLEWICH
Charity Number: 1127335

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SIMON DREW | Chair | 22 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hassall | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Smith | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Prentice | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Tarry | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CURRIE | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katy Drew | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josie Margaret Clewes | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Julie Hassall | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Ikin | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Wilson | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Ikin | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Latham | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Reynolds | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jeffery | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alison Boulton | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEVE BAILEY | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEIL CLEWES | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Keith Yearley | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.