THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST FRANCIS OF ASSISI, BOURNVILLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship open to all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £40,134 from 6 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 30 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
- PCC BOURNVILLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Malcolm Wharton | Chair | 04 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Bethany Jean Conroy | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Mary Rose | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Giles Allen | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew Pinnock | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Tracy Jewison | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Chatfield | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ross Benjamin Baylis | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vicki Emma James | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Mary Rodgers | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Shakespear | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Rodgers | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Slevin | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK EDWIN PENROSE | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM MORSE | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENIS RALPH THOMAS | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA MARY NAYAK M.SC, | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.71k | £141.67k | £165.20k | £185.58k | £202.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317.18k | £184.16k | £189.47k | £174.72k | £218.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.65k | £16.38k | £37.76k | £40.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sycamore Road
Bournville
BIRMINGHAM
B30 2AA
- Phone:
- 01214727215
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window