THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, BEXLEYHEATH

Charity number: 1127820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £384,218
Total expenditure: £277,829

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bexley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 15 March 2024: Funds received from 1161662 SALVATION OF THE LIVING ROCK REVEALED
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • CHRIST CHURCH PCC, BEXLEYHEATH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev TREVOR WYATT Chair 30 April 2014
TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE 14TH WEST KENT (BEXLEYHEATH) COMPANY OF THE BOYS BRIGADE
Received: On time
BEXLEY CENTRE FOR THE UNEMPLOYED LIMITED
Received: On time
TOGETHER FOR THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Recently registered
Margaret Jones Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
David Soile Trustee 28 April 2024
ELBETHEL PRAYER TABERNACLE
Recently registered
SHADDAIVILLE MINISTRIES
Received: On time
Alexander Newson Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Victoria Joan Darton-Bigg Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Carolyn Barbara Ellery Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Victoria Ononiwu Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
David George Groombridge Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
JANE ELIZABETH HILLESS Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
RACHEL MARY MILES Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
SHEILA WINIFRED HANCOCK Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
PATRICIA ANN CROFT Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
ELISABETH PETCHEY Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
PATRICIA MARY PERKS Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record
GLENDA COOPER Trustee 06 June 2011
None on record
ROB HILLESS Trustee
None on record
RICHARD JOHN PERCIVAL LLB JP Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £204.88k £286.05k £231.76k £285.45k £384.22k
Total expenditure £197.88k £304.04k £225.99k £269.30k £277.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 08 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
63 Latham Road
Bexleyheath
DA6 7NN
Phone:
02083038557