ROYSTON & DISTRICT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Transport Scheme helping those without access to public transport to get out and about in Royston and the surrounding villages in North & East Hertfordshire and South Cambridgeshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £38,069 from 19 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 04 December 2008: Standard registration
- 01 December 2021: Funds received from 1029666 ROYSIA WOMENS CLUB
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Gerard Joseph Reilly | Chair | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ronan Hill | Trustee | 14 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Lesley Farrow | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP JOHN ROWE | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Worsey | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lee Bonja | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Richard Frank Heath | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Johnson | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Brian George Johnson | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH PARKER | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.75k | £90.62k | £138.60k | £99.97k | £103.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.56k | £86.83k | £109.27k | £80.80k | £102.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.02k | £5.45k | £34.97k | £45.81k | £38.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 07 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY IS TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF ROYSTON AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES OF NORTH AND EAST HERTFORDSHIRE AND SOUTH CAMBRIDGESHIRE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY, OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
ROYSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYSTON HOSPITAL
LONDON ROAD
ROYSTON
SG8 9EN
- Phone:
- 01763245228
- Email:
- INFO@ROYTRANS.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window