Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF BANBURY CHERWELL TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1127136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 24 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required