Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF BANBURY CHERWELL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1127136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.68k £2.71k £1.17k £12.67k £13.40k
Total expenditure £12.16k £4.05k £3.34k £13.06k £12.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A