RYEDALE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the advice people need for the problems they face To improve the policies and practises that affect people's lives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
Total income includes £129,231 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 February 2009: Standard registration
- 31 May 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 31 May 2018: Funds transferred to 1146084 North Yorkshire Citizens Advice & Law Centre Limit...
- RYEDALE CAB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.86k | £188.78k | £177.82k | £157.02k | £170.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.00k | £184.46k | £179.25k | £147.16k | £177.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £93.17k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £87.31k | £0 | £129.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 12 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2017
(These accounts |
12 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 20 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
20 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 08 February 2016 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2015
(These accounts |
08 February 2016 | 8 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 01 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 01 December 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN NORTH YORKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window