Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH ST GILES & ST NICHOLAS

Charity Number: 1128390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £181.28k £218.51k £371.07k £232.69k £281.79k
Total expenditure £226.03k £227.13k £268.14k £272.83k £303.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £32 £1.08k £9.47k £4.12k £6.74k