WELCOME BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian church, Duke of Edinburgh Award Scheme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 17 December 2008: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel James Arnott | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anandi Ruth Dimon | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Herbert Taylor | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elaine Adams | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Rona Selby | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Leonard Durrant | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Selby | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Roger Stevenson | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Caldwell | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.94k | £159.21k | £152.32k | £170.44k | £188.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.81k | £150.62k | £155.68k | £174.09k | £174.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 24 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Welcome Baptist Church
Alexandra Road
HEATHFIELD
TN21 8EQ
- Phone:
- 01435864646
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window