THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL'S BOLDMERE

Charity number: 1128965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity sets out to provide a range of religious activities across a broad spectrum of ages within the Parish of Boldmere

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST. MICHAEL'S PCC, BOLDMERE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tusheeta Elizabeth David Trustee 18 May 2025
THE NANCY WOODROFFE BAKER TRUST
Received: On time
PETER MALCOLM SWAINE Trustee 18 May 2025
None on record
Trudy Walsh Trustee 18 May 2025
None on record
Gail Margaret Adams Trustee 29 March 2025
None on record
Mark Russell Edmonds Trustee 18 July 2024
None on record
Philip William Thebridge Trustee 30 May 2024
None on record
Dr Matthew Armstrong Lumley Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
MARK LESLIE WILLIAMSON Trustee 25 May 2022
THE NANCY WOODROFFE BAKER TRUST
Received: On time
PAMELA MAY BAXTER Trustee 28 April 2021
None on record
Gary Brian Connell Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Elaine Anne Riley Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Michael Cheeran David Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Edwina Mary Connell Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
JANET ELIZABETH PEEL B ED Trustee 03 June 2013
None on record
MARGARET SMOLDON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £196.85k £159.29k £147.32k £163.08k £1.27m
Total expenditure £227.07k £182.30k £145.83k £150.97k £203.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £86.10k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £22.67k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.21k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £58.46k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.10m
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £195.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.98k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £47.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.59k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.35k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £375.00k
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.75m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £22.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Michaels Church
Church Road
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B73 5RX
Phone:
01213730207