WATERS EDGE ARTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We deliver high quality participatory theatre projects, predominantly for people who are disadvantaged or vulnerable. We create and programme relevant, accessible theatre which challenges and entertains. We run The Edge Theatre & Arts Centre in Manchester, as a resource for community and professional arts and The Dressing Room Cafe which trains learning disabled adults in hospitality & catering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £56,855 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Trafford
Governance
- 17 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr Joanna Rachel Midgley | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Cllr JOHN HACKING | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lawson | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Alan Kolvin | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Foster Morgan | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Akintayo Olutosin Ayoola Akinbode | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Patric Gilchrist | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Sinclair Hill | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Louise Rabbitt | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £312.24k | £281.63k | £612.89k | £453.25k | £444.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £311.23k | £139.58k | £524.57k | £453.98k | £453.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.66k | £148.70k | £149.61k | £15.00k | £56.86k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £11.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £521.57k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £13 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £502.51k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £22.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £6.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY THEATRE, BY ENCOURAGING AND PROMOTING INVOLVEMENT IN THEATRE AND RELATED ARTISTIC AND CREATIVE ACTIVITIES BY ANY MEMBER OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY THOSE DEEMED AS DISADVANTAGED, VULNERABLE OR HARD TO REACH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Edge Theatre & Arts Centre
Manchester Road
Chorlton Cum Hardy
MANCHESTER
M21 9JG
- Phone:
- 01612829776
- Email:
- info@edgetheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window