Trustees WATERS EDGE ARTS LTD
Charity number: 1128608

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr Joanna Rachel Midgley | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Cllr JOHN HACKING | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lawson | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Alan Kolvin | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Foster Morgan | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Akintayo Olutosin Ayoola Akinbode | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Patric Gilchrist | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Sinclair Hill | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Louise Rabbitt | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.