SURBITON HILL METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To worship God and encourage and support people to follow Jesus as Lord and Saviour. To Care for our neighbours To work for justice and the relief of suffering around the world
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 19 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Fullbrook | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Fullbrook | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Ross Strachan | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Helen Margaret Lamb | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Babatope Ojudayi | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Acquah | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jill BRIDGES | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Terence Ingham | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARINA ANNE GOLDING | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Patricia Valerie Lavers | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN INGHAM | Trustee | 02 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MARY TURNER GRSM, LRAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN THORPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEANNETTE BARBARA BARWICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA MARGARET BRIDGES BA, LRAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY CLARE ABBOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CYNTHIA RHONWEN JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
Geoffrey Laurence Turner | Trustee |
|
||||||
ULRICH TEITZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARION THORPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLARE ELIZABETH MAYS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.90k | £205.08k | £279.57k | £222.92k | £276.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.27k | £180.14k | £279.71k | £231.05k | £320.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.08k | £5.53k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 July 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 PINE GARDENS
SURBITON
KT5 8LJ
- Phone:
- 02083990486
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window