Financial history FRIENDS OF ST.MARY`S HUNTON

Charity number: 1127964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £4.82k £1.71k £4.07k £2.15k £4.75k
Total expenditure £15.84k £1.15k £96 £0 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A